NM SB10 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - [LD 22] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - [LD 22] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condo declaration zoning law compliance
Title
Condo declaration zoning law compliance
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.43. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Passed Senate (39-0) | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |