NM HR1 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Archive House Webcasting
Title
Archive House Webcasting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Signed by one or both houses |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Passed House (62-0) |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2016-02-02 | House | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Appropriations & Finance and then to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |