NM HM72 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consider alternatives to deportation
Title
Consider alternatives to deportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | [LD 43] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-19 | Senate | [LD 43] |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (35-10) |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Not Referred to Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Not Printed |