NM HM43 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Plan for older american act business model
Title
Plan for older american act business model
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] SGND. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] HAFC |