NM HM40 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Compliance With Fed Prison Rape Elimination
Title
Compliance With Fed Prison Rape Elimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2023-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:1 |
2023-03-08 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |