NM HM31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study capital outlay for certain projects
Title
Study capital outlay for certain projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Passed House (61-4) |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |