NM HM30 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monitor women receiving job training
Title
Monitor women receiving job training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-06 | [LD 15] Passed House (52-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources |