NM HM28 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - [LD 26] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - [LD 26] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' dept. report to legislature
Title
Veterans' dept. report to legislature
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | [LD 26] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-02-18 | House | [LD 25] Passed House (60-0) |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |