NM HM20 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Use Of Emerging Roadway Technologies
Title
Use Of Emerging Roadway Technologies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2021-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2021-03-11 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC |