NM HM12 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community health specialists task force
Title
Community health specialists task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-06 | Senate | [LD 13] |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (70-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to HHGIC |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Not Referred to Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |