NM HM11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - [LD 23] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - [LD 23] SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"ecoart america challenge"
Title
"ecoart america challenge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | [LD 23] SGND. | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP | |
2011-01-23 | [LD 6] HEC |