NM HM102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abandoned uranium mine reclamation program
Title
Abandoned uranium mine reclamation program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Senate | [LD 34] Signed by one or both houses |
2015-03-06 | Senate | [LD 34] |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Passed House (70-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] HEENC |