NM HM1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-26 - [LD 40] PASSED/H (42-24)- SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-26 - [LD 40] PASSED/H (42-24)- SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family-friendly workplace task force
Title
Family-friendly workplace task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (42-24)- SGND. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HAFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |