NM HJR3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (C.A.5).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (C.A.5).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil offices for former legislators, ca
Title
Civil offices for former legislators, ca
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Park [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (C.A.5). | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] w/drn-SJC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SRC/SJC-SRC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (54-12) | |
2010-02-03 | [LD 12] DP | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] DP-HVEC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HJC/HVEC-HJC |