NM HJR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran Property Tax Exemption, Ca
Title
Veteran Property Tax Exemption, Ca
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to: HRC |
2021-03-09 | House | w/drn h/calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-02 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JR&legno=2&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/resolutions/house/HJR02.pdf |