NM HJR13 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative Session Changes, Ca

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Session Changes, Ca

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-16SenateSent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
2021-03-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:21
2021-03-15HouseFloor substitute adopted
2021-03-13HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2021-03-04HouseSent to HJC - Referrals: HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback