NJ S2544 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes criminal penalties for production or dissemination of deceptive audio or visual media, commonly known as "deepfakes."
Title
Establishes criminal penalties for production or dissemination of deceptive audio or visual media, commonly known as "deepfakes."
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3540 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (60-14-1)