NM HJM9 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement Income Security Task Force
Title
Retirement Income Security Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-02-01 | Senate | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (34-33) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry |