NM HJM7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study Funding To Research Cavernous Angioma
Title
Study Funding To Research Cavernous Angioma
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2019-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SPAC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:0 |
2019-02-20 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-25 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |