NM HJM6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indian health service as entitlement program
Title
Indian health service as entitlement program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (22-0) SGND. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SIAC | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] SRC/SIAC-SRC | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] PASSED/H (60-0) | |
2011-02-04 | [LD 18] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC |