NM HJM43 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - [LD 49] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - [LD 49] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Return chaco canyon artifacts
Title
Return chaco canyon artifacts
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | [LD 49] PASSED/S (38-0) SGND. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] SIAC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] HCPAC |