NM HJM32 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouragement to address inst. racism policy
Title
Encouragement to address inst. racism policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP API. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SPAC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] PASSED/H (38-24) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] HLC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=32&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM032.pdf |