NM HJM30 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study state railroad museum in tucumcari
Title
Study state railroad museum in tucumcari
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] | Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SIAC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SRC/SIAC-SRC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (63-3) | |
2010-02-03 | [LD 12] DP | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] HHGAC |