NM HJM24 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Study Taxation Of Abandoned Properties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Taxation Of Abandoned Properties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Passed House (62-0)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-05House[LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-02-05House[LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback