NM HJM2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"better hearing & speech month"
Title
"better hearing & speech month"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Signed by one or both houses. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (26-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] nt Assigned to com |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Not Printed |
2013-01-15 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |