NM HJM2 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - [LD 30] tbld/s API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - [LD 30] tbld/s API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"better hearing & speech month"
Title
"better hearing & speech month"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | [LD 30] tbld/s API. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] w/drn - PASSED/H (70-0) | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] nt prntd-nt ref com-tbld | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=2&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM002.pdf |