NM HJM16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Interim behavioral health services committee
Title
Interim behavioral health services committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | [LD 21] Passed Senate (38-0) Signed by one or both houses. | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Passed House (61-0) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to House Health & Government Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |