NM HJM12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Review public health objectives
Title
Review public health objectives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP API. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2011-02-05 | [LD 19] PASSED/H (60-0) | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] DP/a | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=12&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM012.pdf |