NM HJM12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (32-5) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (32-5) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"posttraumatic stress disorder awareness day"
Title
"posttraumatic stress disorder awareness day"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (32-5) SGND. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] w/drn | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] tbld/S | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] w/drn - PASSED/H (57-0) | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] nt prntd-nt ref com-tbld | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |