NM HJM10 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"new mexico hunger week"
Title
"new mexico hunger week"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (48-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-27 | House | [LD 5] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to H |