NM HJM1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sanjeev Arora, M.d. For Nobel Prize
Title
Sanjeev Arora, M.d. For Nobel Prize
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:61 N:0 |
2021-02-25 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |