NM HCR1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (39-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (39-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure of legislative information
Title
Disclosure of legislative information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (39-1) |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] On the Speaker's table by rule (temporary calendar)abled temporarily by motion |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (48-16) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |