NM HB98 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 65 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 65 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Tax Bill
Title
Omnibus Tax Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 65 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:42 N:0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2021-03-13 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SFC |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2021-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-02-09 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |