NM HB93 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Academic success through remediation act
Title
Academic success through remediation act
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] | Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (34-29) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Education |
2014-01-23 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |