NM HB93 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] DP - PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.40.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] DP - PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.40.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certain auto dealer acts as unlawful
Title
Certain auto dealer acts as unlawful
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Park [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP - PASSED/S (36-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.40. | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] w/drn-SJC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] SCORC/SJC-SCORC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP/a - PASSED/H (68-0) | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] DP/a-HJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] w/drn - ref HBIC/HJC-HBIC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC |