NM HB90 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Mar.5) Ch.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Mar.5) Ch.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Native american schools dual credit program
Title
Native american schools dual credit program
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Begaye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Mar.5) Ch.36. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] w/drn | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SEC- DP-SFC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] SIAC/SEC/SFC-SIAC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HEC/HAFC-HEC |