NM HB88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Delinquent Property Sales
Title
Tax Delinquent Property Sales
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Armstrong [R] | Sen. Gregory Baca [R] | Rep. Alonzo Baldonado [R] | Rep. Kelly Fajardo [R] |
Rep. William Rehm [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (55-6) |
2018-02-09 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |