NM HB86 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election Day & Early Voting Registration
Title
Election Day & Early Voting Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Daymon Ely [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] | Rep. Patricia Roybal Caballero [D] | Rep. Debra Sarinana [D] |
Sen. Jeff Steinborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:44 N:22 |
2019-02-12 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-31 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |