NM HB81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 188 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Physical Rehab Cost Sharing Limits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Rehab Cost Sharing Limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 188 - Apr. 3
2019-03-13HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2019-03-12SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:20 N:14
2019-03-09SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-06SenateSPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-20SenateSent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SCORC
2019-02-19HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:45 N:16
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-02-12HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-28HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-16HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HCEDC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback