NM HB81 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.3) Ch.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Petroleum storage tank definition changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petroleum storage tank definition changes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-19 [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.3) Ch.27.
2010-02-10 [LD 17] fl/a- PASSED/S (38-0)
2010-02-09 [LD 16] DP
2010-02-01 [LD 10] SCONC
2010-02-10 [LD 17] PASSED/H (65-0)
2010-02-05 [LD 14] DP
2010-02-01 [LD 10] DP-HENRC
2010-01-21 [LD 3] w/drn - ref HHGAC/HENRC-HHGAC
2010-01-19 [LD 1] not prntd-HRC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback