NM HB79 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco settlement fund distribution
Title
Tobacco settlement fund distribution
Sponsors
Rep. Don Tripp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.49. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] w/o rec-SFC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] SPAC/SFC-SPAC | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] PASSED/H (43-18) | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HHGAC/HAFC-HHGAC |