NM HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nmmi Opportunity Scholarship
Title
Nmmi Opportunity Scholarship
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Wooley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 20 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] Passed House (66-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |