NM HB653 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] h/cncrd VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] h/cncrd VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Title
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] h/cncrd VETO. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP - fl/a- PASSED/S (37-0) | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SJC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] w/drn - HJC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] not prntd-HRC |