NM HB644 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Title
Public peace, health, safety & welfare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] SFC API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] fl/a- FAILED/H (28-38)- m/rcnsr adptd- PASSED/H (37-32) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DNP-CS/DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] w/drn - ref HAFC-HAFC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] not prntd-HRC |