NM HB592 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 241 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 241 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
La Merced Del Manzano Land Grant
Title
La Merced Del Manzano Land Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 241 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | SIAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Sent to SIAC - Referrals: SIAC |
2019-03-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC |