NM HB590 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Additional felonies for prison earned time
Title
Additional felonies for prison earned time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (46-18) |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] HSCAC |
2015-02-25 | House | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to HSCAC |