NM HB58 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retiree Health Care Contribution Rates
Title
Retiree Health Care Contribution Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (55-7) |
2016-01-25 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-21 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Health |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Health and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |