NM HB55 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public works project wage calculations
Title
Public works project wage calculations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | [LD 38] Passed House (31-28) |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | [LD 33] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-17 | House | [LD 21] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HBEC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HBEC and then to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |