NM HB55 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (42-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (42-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.49.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local government planning fund
Title
Local government planning fund
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Crook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | [LD 21] Passed Senate (42-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.6) Ch.49. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Conservation | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-03 | [LD 14] Passed House (61-0) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Health & Government Affairs | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to House Health & Government Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |