NM HB549 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 58 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 58 - Mar. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removal Of Partially Consumed Wine
Title
Removal Of Partially Consumed Wine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 58 - Mar. 14 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0 |
2019-02-24 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC |